ARNIE'S BLUE
Current Trainer
No current trainer
Trainer History
Name | From | To |
---|---|---|
JOSEPH GREGUS (Lalor) | 18/07/1997 | 28/07/1998 |
RAYMOND SHIELLS (DIAMOND CREEK) | 15/05/1997 | 16/07/1997 |
PAUL ARNAUD (KILSYTH) | 24/02/1997 | 14/05/1997 |
CARL HAAS (TYNONG) | 05/12/1996 | 02/02/1997 |
JENNIFER THORPE (ARTHURS CREEK) | 04/10/1996 | 04/12/1996 |
* = Current